NE LB448 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB448 amended into LB447 by AM1979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB448 amended into LB447 by AM1979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change membership of the Nebraska Investment Council and retirement provisions for Class V school districts
Title
Change membership of the Nebraska Investment Council and retirement provisions for Class V school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB448 amended into LB447 by AM1979 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB447 amended into LB448 by AM1555 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Larson MO125 approved |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Larson MO125 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 15, 2016 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist FA71 pending |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist FA71 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1705 lost |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1705 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1704 adopted |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1704 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1698 adopted |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1698 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER139 adopted |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER139 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER139 |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Kolterman FA66 lost |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Kolterman FA66 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1555 adopted |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1555 pending |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1555 filed |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1555 |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2015-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |