NE LB438 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB438 amended into LB157 by AM2002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB438 amended into LB157 by AM2002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an award of attorney’s fees in appeals and change and modernize third-party practice provisions
Title
Provide for an award of attorney’s fees in appeals and change and modernize third-party practice provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB438 amended into LB157 by AM2002 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-05-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |