NE LB434 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to tax expenditure reports and certain joint hearings of legislative committees
Title
Change provisions relating to tax expenditure reports and certain joint hearings of legislative committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Revenue AM1578 filed |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1578 |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |