NE LB427 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB427 amended into LB191 by AM1330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB427 amended into LB191 by AM1330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate fees relating to nonresident contractors under the Contractor Registration Act
Title
Eliminate fees relating to nonresident contractors under the Contractor Registration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB427 amended into LB191 by AM1330 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |