NE LB402 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB402 amended into LB227 by AM1332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB402 amended into LB227 by AM1332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine home health agency under Health Care Facility Licensure Act
Title
Redefine home health agency under Health Care Facility Licensure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB402 amended into LB227 by AM1332 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM392 filed |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM392 |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |