NE LB4 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change tuition credit provisions for the Active Selected Reserve of the armed forces of the United States
Title
Change tuition credit provisions for the Active Selected Reserve of the armed forces of the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM21 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM21 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER7 adopted |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER7 filed |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER7 |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Day name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Geist name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM21 adopted |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Flood name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Lathrop name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Arch name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Moser name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Dorn name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Aguilar name added |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Pahls name added |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-01-28 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM21 filed |
2021-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM21 |
2021-01-21 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |