NE LB398 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions and penalties relating to certain excessively loaded vehicles
Title
Change provisions and penalties relating to certain excessively loaded vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER20 adopted |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER20 filed |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER20 |
2013-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |