NE LB374 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax credit for corporate income taxes paid and change sunset dates under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Title
Provide an income tax credit for corporate income taxes paid and change sunset dates under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31201 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB374.pdf |