NE LB368 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a subsidized employment pilot program within the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Create a subsidized employment pilot program within the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-7-8 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA143 withdrawn |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Chambers FA143 filed |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | McCoy AM1518 adopted |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Nordquist FA99 adopted |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Nordquist FA99 filed |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | McCoy AM1518 pending |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | McCoy AM1518 filed |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Hansen AM1464 lost |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER111 adopted |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER111 filed |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER111 |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Hansen AM1464 filed |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM1515 lost |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM1515 filed |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM816 adopted |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM1257 withdrawn |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM1257 filed |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Crawford AM1224 adopted |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM816 pending |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Crawford AM1224 filed |
2013-04-02 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM816 filed |
2013-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM816 |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2013-02-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013 (cancel) |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Adams motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |