NE LB361 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt sales of clothing and footwear from sales and use taxes as prescribed
Title
Exempt sales of clothing and footwear from sales and use taxes as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 17, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31267 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB361.pdf |