NE LB359 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions in the Employment Security Law and Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act and relating to appointment of the meatpacking industry worker rights coordinator
Title
Change provisions in the Employment Security Law and Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act and relating to appointment of the meatpacking industry worker rights coordinator
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |