NE LB351 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to veteran designations on operators' licenses and state identification cards
Title
Change provisions relating to veteran designations on operators' licenses and state identification cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM853 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM853 |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31236 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB351.pdf |