NE LB330 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB330 amended into LB600 by AM1241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change the administration, duties, membership, purpose, and reports of the Nebraska Children's Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the administration, duties, membership, purpose, and reports of the Nebraska Children's Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB330 amended into LB600 by AM1241
2019-05-31LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2019-05-31LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2019-05-24LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2019-04-10LegislatureExecutive Board AM979 filed
2019-04-10LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM979
2019-02-12LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 20, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureRereferred to Executive Board
2019-01-18LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback