NE LB329 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Enrollment and Review ER165 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change eligibility provisions for transitional child care assistance under the federal child care subsidy program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change eligibility provisions for transitional child care assistance under the federal child care subsidy program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Howard AM2186 adopted (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1183 adopted (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER165 filed
2020-02-13LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER165
2020-02-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-11LegislatureHoward AM2186 adopted
2020-02-11LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1183 adopted
2020-01-30LegislatureHoward AM2186 filed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-04-25LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1183 filed
2019-04-25LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1183
2019-01-29LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2019
2019-01-18LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback