NE LB327 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB327 amended into LB452 by AM636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB327 amended into LB452 by AM636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a personal finance or financial literacy credit for high school graduation
Title
Require a personal finance or financial literacy credit for high school graduation
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB327 amended into LB452 by AM636 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |