NE LB322 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit creation of new joint public agencies with power or authority relating to tax
Title
Prohibit creation of new joint public agencies with power or authority relating to tax
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |