NE LB302 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB302 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB302 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to conflicts of interest by certain officeholders and public employees
Title
Change provisions relating to conflicts of interest by certain officeholders and public employees
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB302 amended into LB287 by AM2060 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-25 | Legislature | Linehan AM1368 filed |
2023-03-01 | Legislature | Linehan AM603 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM503 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM503 |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |