NE LB299 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require approval by the voters of a school district or educational service unit for the issuance of certain bonds under the Interlocal Cooperation Act
Title
Require approval by the voters of a school district or educational service unit for the issuance of certain bonds under the Interlocal Cooperation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Linehan AM2031 withdrawn |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Linehan AM2031 filed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |