NE LB298 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine public benefits and change provisions of the Employment Security Law relating to the disqualification of certain aliens
Title
Redefine public benefits and change provisions of the Employment Security Law relating to the disqualification of certain aliens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM251 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM251 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM251 adopted |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM251 filed |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM251 |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | McDonnell priority bill |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. name added |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-01-26 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |