NE LB298 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB298 amended into LB225 by AM611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB298 amended into LB225 by AM611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Strengthening Families Act and a task force
Title
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Strengthening Families Act and a task force
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Baker [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB298 amended into LB225 by AM611 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM537 filed |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM537 |
2017-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31230 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB298.pdf |