NE LB293 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the number of and qualifications for members of the Public Service Commission
Title
Change the number of and qualifications for members of the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |