NE LB291 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Special Economic Impact Zone Act and change the Nebraska Investment Finance Authority Act and the Nebraska Revenue Act of 1967 as prescribed
Title
Adopt the Special Economic Impact Zone Act and change the Nebraska Investment Finance Authority Act and the Nebraska Revenue Act of 1967 as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Smith FA162 pending |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Smith FA162 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 adopted |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER55 |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Larson AM941 adopted |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Larson AM941 filed |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Revenue AM530 adopted |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Revenue AM530 filed |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM530 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Larson priority bill |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31284 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB291.pdf |