NE LB29 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designate Juneteenth National Independence Day as a state holiday
Title
Designate Juneteenth National Independence Day as a state holiday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Wayne AM2390 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1610 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Legislature - Wayne AM2390 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1610 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST61 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Wayne AM2390 adopted |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Wayne AM2390 filed |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA105 withdrawn |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1610 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA105 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1610 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1610 |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |