NE LB278 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB278 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB278 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine disability and change disability retirement application and medical examination provisions for various retirement acts
Title
Redefine disability and change disability retirement application and medical examination provisions for various retirement acts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB278 amended into LB415 by AM923 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM451 filed |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM451 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31086 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB278.pdf |