NE LB278 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to fees charged by the Secretary of State
Title
Change provisions relating to fees charged by the Secretary of State
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 07, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA189 adopted |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA189 filed |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA188 withdrawn |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA188 pending |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA188 filed |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA185 lost |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA185 filed |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA184 adopted |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Chambers FA184 filed |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Schumacher MO127 withdrawn |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Schumacher MO127 Bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Pending |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |