NE LB274 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB274 by AM427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB274 by AM427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for taxation of ready-to-drink cocktails, the sale of mixed alcoholic beverages by certain retailers and farm wineries, and promotional farmers market special designated licenses under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Title
Provide for taxation of ready-to-drink cocktails, the sale of mixed alcoholic beverages by certain retailers and farm wineries, and promotional farmers market special designated licenses under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Lowe AM1071 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Groene AM870 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Legislature - Lowe AM667 adopted (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Legislature - Geist AM668 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - General Affairs AM427 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Hilkemann MO12 failed (Y: 2 N: 20 NV: 24 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Hilkemann FA4 lost (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Lowe AM1071 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Groene AM870 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Legislature - Lowe AM667 adopted (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Legislature - Geist AM668 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - General Affairs AM427 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Hilkemann MO12 failed (Y: 2 N: 20 NV: 24 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Legislature - Hilkemann FA4 lost (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB578 amended into LB274 by AM427 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB415 amended into LB274 by AM870 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB295 amended into LB274 by AM667 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB72 amended into LB274 by AM427 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Lowe AM1071 adopted |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Lowe AM1071 filed |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST6 |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Groene AM870 adopted |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Groene AM870 filed |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM646 withdrawn |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM646 pending |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Lowe AM667 adopted |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Geist AM668 adopted |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER18 adopted |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Lowe AM667 filed |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Geist AM668 filed |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM646 filed |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER18 filed |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER18 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | General Affairs AM427 adopted |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann MO12 failed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann MO12 Recommit to the General Affairs Committee filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann FA4 lost |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann FA4 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM479 withdrawn |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM479 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Wishart AM475 withdrawn |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Wishart AM475 filed |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | General Affairs AM427 filed |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM427 |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |