NE LB269A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Legislature | Seiler explanation of vote |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA105 withdrawn |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Chambers FA105 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Campbell AM1291 adopted |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Campbell AM1291 filed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Campbell AM1163 adopted |
2013-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-04-25 | Legislature | Campbell AM1163 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |