NE LB262 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for participation in the bridge to independence program by young adults not lawfully present in the United States
Title
Provide for participation in the bridge to independence program by young adults not lawfully present in the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |