NE LB258 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to banking and finance
Title
Change provisions relating to banking and finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER12 adopted |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER12 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER12 |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |