NE LB241 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide an exception to the annual privacy notice requirement under the Privacy of Insurance Consumer Information Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide an exception to the annual privacy notice requirement under the Privacy of Insurance Consumer Information Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 10, 2017
2017-05-04LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 04, 2017
2017-05-04LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-04LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-05-02LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-20LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM100 adopted
2017-02-02LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM100 filed
2017-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM100
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback