NE LB241 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize voters to change election of county offices from partisan to nonpartisan
Title
Authorize voters to change election of county offices from partisan to nonpartisan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-25 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18222 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB241.pdf |