NE LB232 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB232 amended into LB306 by AM1114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB232 amended into LB306 by AM1114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change judges' salaries
Title
Change judges' salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB232 amended into LB306 by AM1114 |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone approved |
2013-06-03 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM1090 filed |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM200 adopted |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2013-03-05 | Legislature | Judiciary AM200 filed |
2013-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM200 |
2013-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2013 |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18634 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB232.pdf |