NE LB230 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to partition actions
Title
Change provisions relating to partition actions
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-04-09 | Legislature | Revenue AM752 filed |
2015-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM752 |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |