NE LB222 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Volunteer Emergency Responders Incentive Act
Title
Change the Volunteer Emergency Responders Incentive Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Revenue AM424 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Revenue AM424 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 26, 2019 |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA54 withdrawn |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA54 filed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Revenue AM424 adopted |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Revenue AM424 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM424 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |