NE LB222 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change membership and provide, change, and eliminate powers and duties of the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Title
Change membership and provide, change, and eliminate powers and duties of the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST9 |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Stinner FA53 adopted |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Blood AM816 adopted |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER38 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Stinner FA53 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Blood AM816 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER38 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER38 |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Blood FA49 lost |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Blood FA49 filed |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Clements priority bill |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |