NE LB213 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an efficiency review of state agencies
Title
Provide for an efficiency review of state agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |