NE LB191 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Critical Infrastructure Utility Worker Protection Act and change provisions relating to the Contractor Registration Act, the Employment Security Law, the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act, and the Rural Workforce Housing Investment Act
Title
Adopt the Critical Infrastructure Utility Worker Protection Act and change provisions relating to the Contractor Registration Act, the Employment Security Law, the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act, and the Rural Workforce Housing Investment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Legislature - Riepe FA70 lost (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Legislature - Riepe AM1514 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM1330 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Halloran MO969 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO351 failed (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO350 failed (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO967 failed (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO352 failed (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO963 failed (Y: 1 N: 16 NV: 22 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - Legislature - Riepe FA70 lost (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Legislature - Riepe AM1514 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM1330 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Halloran MO969 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO351 failed (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO350 failed (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO967 failed (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO352 failed (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO963 failed (Y: 1 N: 16 NV: 22 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2023 |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2023 |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO356 withdrawn |
2023-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST10 |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO353 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO354 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO355 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | McDonnell AM1411 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1404 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Halloran AM1507 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Halloran AM1507 filed |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | McDonnell AM1520 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | McDonnell AM1520 filed |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe FA72 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe FA71 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe FA70 lost |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe AM1514 adopted |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe AM1373 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Riepe AM1363 withdrawn |
2023-04-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER29 adopted |
2023-04-26 | Legislature | Riepe AM1514 filed |
2023-04-26 | Legislature | Riepe FA72 filed |
2023-04-26 | Legislature | Riepe FA71 filed |
2023-04-26 | Legislature | Riepe FA70 filed |
2023-04-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER29 |
2023-04-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER29 filed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM1330 adopted |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Halloran MO969 prevailed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Halloran MO969 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO968 withdrawn |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO968 Reconsider the vote taken on MO351 filed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO351 failed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | McDonnell AM1411 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1404 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | MO351 pending |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO967 failed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO967 Reconsider vote on MO352 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Halloran MO966 Bracket until June 9, 2023 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Halloran MO965 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Section 3f filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Halloran MO964 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO352 failed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | MO352 pending |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO963 failed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | MO963 pending |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO963 Reconsider MO350 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO350 failed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | MO350 pending |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Riepe AM1363 filed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Riepe AM1373 filed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM1330 filed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1330 |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO355 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO352 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO356 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO354 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO351 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO353 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO350 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Business and Labor priority bill |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2023 |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |