NE LB18A | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Krist AM1850 filed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-02-02 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=25606 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/104/PDF/Intro/LB18A.pdf |