NE LB188 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for recall petition signatures
Title
Change requirements for recall petition signatures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2011-01-19 | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2011 | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12155 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB188.pdf |