NE LB17 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB24 amended into LB17 by AM461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB24 amended into LB17 by AM461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change fees for and provide for transfers to the Nebraska Retirement Fund for Judges and change actuarial valuation and amortization provisions for certain state retirement systems
Title
Change fees for and provide for transfers to the Nebraska Retirement Fund for Judges and change actuarial valuation and amortization provisions for certain state retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 33-13-3 (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Kolterman AM929 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM900 lost (Y: 2 N: 23 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Kolterman AM978 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM461 adopted (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Kolterman AM929 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM900 lost (Y: 2 N: 23 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Kolterman AM978 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM461 adopted (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB24 amended into LB17 by AM461 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB16 amended into LB17 by AM461 |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 33-13-3 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Kolterman AM929 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM900 lost |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM900 filed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Kolterman AM978 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Kolterman AM929 pending |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 adopted |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Kolterman AM978 filed |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Kolterman AM929 filed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 filed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER55 |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM461 adopted |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Wayne AM900 withdrawn |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Wayne AM900 filed |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM884 withdrawn |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM884 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM461 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM461 |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |