NE LB161 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Pairing Equity to Enterprises Act and provide for a transfer from the Cash Reserve Fund
Title
Adopt the Pairing Equity to Enterprises Act and provide for a transfer from the Cash Reserve Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 11, 2015 |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |