NE LB16 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the withholding of records relating to certain critical infrastructure
Title
Provide for the withholding of records relating to certain critical infrastructure
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Briese AM636 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Briese AM636 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Briese AM636 adopted |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Briese AM636 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | La Grone name added |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |