NE LB1414 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Property Tax Growth Limitation Act and change provisions relating to budget limitations
Title
Adopt the Property Tax Growth Limitation Act and change provisions relating to budget limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2024 |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |