NE LB140 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for Czech Heritage license plates
Title
Provide for Czech Heritage license plates
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Legislature - Brandt FA206 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Hunt MO33 failed (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Legislature - Hunt AM470 lost (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2024-01-30 - Legislature - Brandt FA206 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Legislature - Hunt MO33 failed (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Legislature - Hunt AM470 lost (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Brandt FA206 adopted |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Brandt FA206 filed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Hunt MO33 failed |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Hunt MO33 Reconsider AM470 filed |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Hunt AM470 lost |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Hunt AM470 filed |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2023 |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2023-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |