NE LB140 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for primary elections for partisan county offices without party affiliation in counties with less than 10,000 population
Title
Provide for primary elections for partisan county offices without party affiliation in counties with less than 10,000 population
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |