NE LB1372 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to individual and corporate income tax rates and property tax credits
Title
Change provisions relating to individual and corporate income tax rates and property tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |