NE LB1325 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1325 amended into LB1355 by AM2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1325 amended into LB1355 by AM2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow pharmacists and local public health departments to distribute fentanyl strips as prescribed
Title
Allow pharmacists and local public health departments to distribute fentanyl strips as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1325 amended into LB1355 by AM2559 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |