NE LB1301 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Foreign-owned Real Estate National Security Act
Title
Adopt the Foreign-owned Real Estate National Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barry DeKay [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Legislature - DeKay AM3182 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2594 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - DeKay AM2919 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Legislature - DeKay AM3182 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2594 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - DeKay AM2919 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | DeKay AM3182 adopted |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | DeKay FA205 withdrawn |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 adopted |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | DeKay AM3182 to ER104 filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER104 |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | DeKay FA204 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | DeKay FA203 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2594 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Wayne AM3095 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Wayne AM3095 to AM2594 filed |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | DeKay AM2919 adopted |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | DeKay AM2919 to AM2594 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2594 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2594 |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Hardin name added |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | DeKay priority bill |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | DeKay FA205 filed |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | DeKay FA204 filed |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | DeKay FA203 filed |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Holdcroft name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Lippincott name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Kauth name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Dorn name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | von Gillern name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Aguilar name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |