NE LB1276 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for civil actions against law enforcement officers who commit misconduct and exempt such actions from the Political Subdivisions Tort Claims Act and the State Tort Claims Act
Title
Provide for civil actions against law enforcement officers who commit misconduct and exempt such actions from the Political Subdivisions Tort Claims Act and the State Tort Claims Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |