NE LB127 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change input into determinations and management plans for regulation of water
Title
Change input into determinations and management plans for regulation of water
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-22 | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12239 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB127.pdf |